Phoenix Insurance Company, The v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Phoenix Insurance Company, The
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 0:2021cv01514
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 9/16/2021 at 2:00 PM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. *TIME CHANGE ONLY. (HAM)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 01:00 PM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Robinson, Neal)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal J Robinson on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Robinson, Neal)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Robinson, Neal)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Phoenix Insurance Company, The re #7 Summons Returned Executed (Meyer, Lance)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phoenix Insurance Company, The. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Meyer, Lance)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (KNK)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1514 (WMW/TNL). (KNK)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Phoenix Insurance Company, The. (Meyer, Lance)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance D Meyer on behalf of Phoenix Insurance Company, The. (Meyer, Lance)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Insurance Company, The (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8852362) filed by Phoenix Insurance Company, The. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Meyer, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Insurance Company, The v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Lance D Meyer
Represented By: Dale O. Thornsjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Neal J Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?