Maplebrook Estates Homeowner's Association, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Maplebrook Estates Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01532
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Jay, Jonathan)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer due 7/21/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/12/2021. (KAT)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Jay, Jonathan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Maplebrook Estates Homeowner's Association. (Jay, Jonathan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE:Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Instructions for joining the call will be sent to counsel by separate email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (BJP)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1532 SRN/KMM. (KDS)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jay Becker re #1 Notice of Removal, by Hartford Fire Insurance Company . (Jay, Jonathan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jonathan D. Jay re #1 Notice of Removal, by Hartford Fire Insurance Company . (Jay, Jonathan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, Fourth Judicial District, County of Hennepin (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8856409) filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jay, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maplebrook Estates Homeowner's Association, Inc. v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maplebrook Estates Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Represented By: John Wittmer
Represented By: Alexander M Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan D Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?