Hansmeier v. MacLaughlin et al
Plaintiff: Paul Hansmeier
Defendant: Anders Folk, David MacLaughlin, Nicols Properties LLC and Benjamin Langer
Case Number: 0:2021cv01551
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot (40) Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot (77) Motion for Filing Restriction; denying as moot (89) Motion to Strike Pleading ; denying as moot (98) Motion to Remand to State Court; denying as moot (19) Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot (30) Motion to Dismiss in case 0:20-cv-02155-JRT-LIB; denying (31) Motion for a Limited Evidentiary Hearing; and denying (12) Motion to Remand to State Court in case 0:21-cv-01167-JRT-LIB. Until the Court resolves the motion to dismiss in ECF 21-1167 and lifts this Order, all proceedings shall be stayed in ECF 21-748; ECF 21-1426; ECF 21-1537; ECF 21-1538; ECF 21-1539; ECF 21-1540; ECF 21-1542; ECF 21-1543; ECF 21-1547; ECF 21-1550; ECF 21-1551; ECF 21-1552; and ECF 21-1553. The terms of the stay in this Order shall apply automatically to actions later instituted in or removed to this Court that involve allegations by Plaintiff that the Challenged Statutes, as enforced by the Federal Defendants, are unconstitutional. Counsel for the Federal Defendants or Plaintiff, as the case may be, must call to the attention of the Clerk of Court the filing or removal of any such action.(Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/17/2021. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-02155-JRT-LIB et al.(HMA)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text-Only) ORDER On August 9, 2021, Plaintiff Paul Hansmeier filed a letter #21 requesting leave to file "a motion for sanctions to address litigation misconduct on the Government's part." Plaintiff alleges that the "Department of Justice has place [him] in administrative detention based on their disapproval of this litigation." As a result of this alleged conduct, Plaintiff ostensibly seeks an Order of this Court imposing sanctions upon Defendants, David MacLaughlin and Anders Folk. Plaintiff's letter request is DENIED. The alleged conduct of which Plaintiff takes issue is allegedly being committed by a party distinct and separate from the parties upon which Plaintiff seeks to impose sanctions. Defendants, David MacLaughlin and Anders Folk, are associated with the Department of Justice. The conditions of Plaintiff's incarceration, which he cites in support of his request for sanctions, are controlled by the Federal Bureau of Prisons not Defendants or the Department of Justice. Plaintiff improperly conflates the Department of Justice and the Federal Bureau of Prisons. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/12/2021.(JLB)
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Qc'd on 8/21/2021 (KNK).
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Qc'd on 8/21/2021 (KNK).
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin . (Rau, Kristen)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Anders Folk, David MacLaughlin, Nicols Properties LLC. (lmb) cc: Hansmeier. Modified text on 7/29/2021 (lmb).
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 8/3/2021 (MMG).
July 26, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paul Hansmeier.(MMP) Document QC'd on 8/11/2021 (MTP).
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 8/11/2021 (MTP).
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Paul Hansmeier. (MMP) Qc'd on 7/24/2021 (KNK).
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #5 Motion/Request to Extend filed by Paul Hansmeier.(MMP) Qc'd on 7/24/2021 (KNK).
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Qc'd on 7/26/2021 (KNK).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1551 JRT/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/9/2021.(kt)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER in Response to #5 Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/9/2021.(JRG)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Division-Civil Rights List. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1551 (WMW/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMP)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 5th Division Civil Rights Housing/Accomodations ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1551 (PJS/LIB). (MMP)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 Request, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Proposed Order to Judge, #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #6 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Rau, Kristen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond #5 Request. (Rau, Kristen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin. (Rau, Kristen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin.(Rau, Kristen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rau, Kristen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin. (Rau, Kristen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County - Fourth Judicial District filed by Anders Folk, Benjamin Langer, David MacLaughlin. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rau, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansmeier v. MacLaughlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anders Folk
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David MacLaughlin
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicols Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Langer
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?