Optimum Cleaning LLC v. Secura Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Optimum Cleaning LLC
Defendant: Secura Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01656
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Optimum Cleaning LLC. (Wittmer, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Optimum Cleaning LLC.(Wittmer, John)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Secura Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Secura Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Secura Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-01656 ECT/LIB. (MTP)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cass County District Court, case number 11-CV-21-1167 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8890239) filed by Secura Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #3 FILED IN ERROR: Exhibit(s) Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 FILED IN ERROR: Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Stephen M. Warner, #5 Exhibit(s) Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court Clerk of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Warner, Stephen) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optimum Cleaning LLC v. Secura Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optimum Cleaning LLC
Represented By: Alexander M Jadin
Represented By: John Wittmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen M Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?