Buck v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Joel Michael Buck
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2021cv01660
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case and is now assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1660 PAM/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Joel Michael Buck. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/10/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (MKB)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Wirmani on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Wirmani, Tracey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Joel Michael Buck. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (MKB)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (MMP)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/28/2021. (KAT)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Social Security List. Please use case number 21-cv-1660 KMM. (MMG)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joel Michael Buck. (Greeman, James)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Joel Michael Buck. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greeman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Michael Buck
Represented By: James H Greeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Tracey Wirmani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?