Velin et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Velin and Sharon Velin
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01670
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 08:00 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Joint update letter due no later than 11/30/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Expert Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 4/14/2022. Motions (disp) due by 7/29/2022. Ready for trial due by 11/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/1/2021.(LNP)
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 Text Only Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2021 by Conference Bridge. Discussion of pretrial deadlines and early settlement. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. TIME: 3:05 - 4:03 PM. Counsel for Plaintiffs: Justice Ericson Lindell. Counsel for Defendant: Kathleen K. Curtis, Scott G. Williams. (LNP)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER - TIME CHANGE: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the starting time of the Pretrial Conference, currently set for 3:30 PM on 9/1/2021, is being changed. The Pretrial Conference will now be conducted by the undersigned at 3:00 PM on 9/1/2021 by Conference Bridge. Call-in instructions have been provided to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/30/2021.(LNP)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Sharon Velin, Thomas Velin. Jointly Signed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Lindell, Justice)
August 13, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen K. Curtis in OPPOSITION TO #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Letter)(Curtis, Kathleen)
August 13, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Curtis, Kathleen)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert : Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2021 at 10:15 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Lindell, Justice)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by Thomas Velin.(Lindell, Justice)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Appoint Expert filed by Thomas Velin.(Lindell, Justice)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Appoint Expert : Date and time to be determined. (Lindell, Justice)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Expert filed by Thomas Velin. (Lindell, Justice)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENTS. MOTION to Appoint Expert Appraisal Umpire filed by Thomas Velin. (Lindell, Justice) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (lmb).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/25/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 03:30 PM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Williams, Scott)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1670 SRN/HB. (MMG)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Williams, Scott)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE - ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Williams, Scott) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (MMP).
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wright County District Court, case number 86-CV-21-3212 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8894150) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velin et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Velin
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Velin
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Kathleen K Curtis
Represented By: Scott G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?