State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv01711
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. United States of America served on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Johnson, Alyssa)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of United States of America. (Voss, Ana)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MMP)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1711 (PJS/KMM). (MMP)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8912799) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Alyssa) Modified text on 7/27/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Alyssa Leigh Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?