C.B.S. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: C.B.S. and Stephanie Hope Smith
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2021cv01747
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/22/2021. Confidential settlement letter due by 11/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 09:15 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Tweeten, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of United States of America. (Tweeten, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Hannah Albrecht (Hacker, Max)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hannah R. Albrecht as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MMP)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1747 (JRT/HB). (MMP)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8925467) filed by C.B.S. et al. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hacker, Max) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.B.S. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.B.S.
Represented By: James S Ballentine
Represented By: Max Henry Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hope Smith
Represented By: James S Ballentine
Represented By: Max Henry Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?