Trottier v. Gainor et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Mary Trottier
Defendant: John Gainor and DQ/Orange Julius
Case Number: 0:2021cv01759
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Katherine Mary Trottier (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff Katherine Mary Trottier filewithin 21 days of this Orders datean amended complaint properly signed by Trottier or an attorney representing her, failing which this Court may recommend dismissing this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/10/2021.(TMA)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:21-cv-00839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty and referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other List.
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of TRANSFER - The Clerk of Court shall transfer this matter to the District of Minnesota this case shall be closed. This Court expresses no opinion as to whether or how the case should proceed with respect to the failure to sign the complaint, the pending application to proceed in forma pauperis, or otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katherine Mary Trottier. Address updated to match address on application: 730 S Plaza Drive Apt 112, Saint Paul, MN, 55120-1507. #2 and #3 re-mailed to new address. (DRS) Modified to restrict access on 6/9/2021 pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order, addressed to Katherine Mary Trottier. Order has been previously remailed to 730 S. Plaza Dr Apt 112, Mendota Hts MN 55170-1507 pursuant to #4 Clerk's entry. (DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Forward Time Expired re #2 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas addressed to Katherine Mary Trottier. New Address of 730 S. Plaza Dr Apt 112, Mendota Hts MN 55170-1507 supplied by Post office. #2 Advisory letter and #3 Order re-mailed this date (DRS) Modified on 5/20/2021 (DRS). Modified to seal document on 6/9/2021 pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 (SLD). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Amended Complaint must be filed no later than 6/7/2021 and IFP Application or Payment of filing fees in full must be received by 6/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Non-Inmate IFP application Included- DRS) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice/Consent to Email) (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AF) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trottier v. Gainor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Mary Trottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DQ/Orange Julius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?