Trottier v. Knapp et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Mary Trottier
Defendant: Gordon Knapp and Clint Ihrek
Case Number: 0:2021cv01771
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE from Hank Falstad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 9/16/2021 (MTP).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Based on the foregoing, and on all of the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within 21 days of this Order' s date, Plaintiff Katherine Mary Trottier shall file an amended complaint properly signed by Trottier or an attorney representing her, failing which this Court may recommend dismissing this action without prejudice for failure to prosecute.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a complaint form to Trottier.Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/31/2021. (EB) cc:Katherine Mary Trottier with a blank complaint. Modified text on 8/31/2021 (MMG).
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Katherine Mary Trottier (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd by JME on 9/3/2021 (JME).
August 19, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. A copy of the docket sheet was mailed to Gordan Knapp at Bridgestone Americas, Inc., 535 Marriott Drive, Nashville, TN 37214-0990 and returned as undeliverable. No forwarding address available mail not resent. (MKB) Document QC'd by JME on 8/26/2021 (JME).
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:21-cv-00822. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel from the Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1771 (NEB/TNL).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer this matter to the District of Minnesota and that this case be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Violation of the Local Rules and filer action required. - ERROR : Document #6 was not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Katherine Mary Trottier. CORRECTION: Filer is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Documents #6 is restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katherine Mary Trottier. (DRS) Modified to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 on 6/7/2021 (DKJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Return to Sender Wrong Address re #3 Order addressed to Katherine Mary Trottier. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2021: #1 Returned Mail (Order). P's forwarding address updated on 5/19/21 re #4 ; Order remailed on 5/24/2021. (YAW) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas addressed to Katherine Mary Trottier; document remailed to fwd address on 5/19/21. Updated P's fwd address. (YAW) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that is properly signed by Plaintiff or by a licensed attorney representing Plaintiff. Amended Complaint deadline: 6/7/2021. Plaintiff must also either pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 6/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Non-Inmate Instructions and Form)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice/Consent) (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trottier v. Knapp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Mary Trottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Ihrek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?