Global Commodities, Inc. v. Muntas Distribution L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Global Commodities, Inc.
Defendant: Muntas Distribution, LLC, Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C. and Mohammed Bihi an individual doing business as Muntas Distribution
Case Number: 0:2021cv01773
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 21-cv-2068 DWF/DTS has been reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/24/2021.(CLK)
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General RULE 12. (Cooper, Stephen)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2021. Confidential settlement letter due by 11/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 09:00 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM re #20 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion, #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) meet & confer Statement)(Cooper, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General AMENDED COMPLAINT : Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Cooper, Stephen)
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss/General AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C.. (Cooper, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Global Commodities, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-33) (Weyrauch, John)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C..(Cooper, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss/General RULE 12 filed by Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cooper, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Cooper, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, REFILED, See Doc. no. #19 . MOTION to Dismiss/General RULE 12 filed by Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C.. (Cooper, Stephen) Modified text on 9/27/2021 (KNK).
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W Cooper on behalf of All Defendants. (Cooper, Stephen)
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Bob Yates re: Service of Summons and Complaint byGlobal Commodities, Inc.. (Weyrauch, John)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Howard J. Peart re: Service of Summons and Complaint byGlobal Commodities, Inc.. (Weyrauch, John)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A O'Rourke for Global Commodities, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/6/2021. (JGK)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Weyrauch, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED. REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Weyrauch, John) Modified text on 8/5/2021 (KNK).
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mohammed Bihi, Muntas Distribution L.L.C.. (MMG)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1773 NEB/HB. (MMG)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R Forrest on behalf of Global Commodities, Inc.. (Forrest, Peter)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A. O'Rourke. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8929673 filed by Global Commodities, Inc.. (Weyrauch, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Global Commodities, Inc.. (Weyrauch, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8929637) filed by Global Commodities, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exs. 1-33, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weyrauch, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Commodities, Inc. v. Muntas Distribution L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: John M Weyrauch
Represented By: Peter R Forrest
Represented By: Thomas A O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muntas Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Bihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muntas Distribution L.L.C.
Represented By: Stacey R Everson
Represented By: Stephen W Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Bihi an individual doing business as Muntas Distribution
Represented By: Stacey R Everson
Represented By: Stephen W Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?