Brown v. Birkholz et al
Petitioner: William Brown
Respondent: B. Birkholz and Michael Carvajal
Case Number: 0:2021cv01807
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(MTP)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Case dismissed. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/15/2021.(HMA)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/31/2021. (KAT)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of B. Birkholz, Michael Carvajal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rau, Kristen)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: William Brown. (JGK)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of William Brown by William Brown. (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/31/2021 (MMG).
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Brown. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/31/2021 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Birkholz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Birkholz
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Carvajal
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?