Terrell v. Birkholz et al
Petitioner: Michael Terrell, Jr.
Respondent: B. Birkholz and Michael Carvajal
Case Number: 0:2021cv01808
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Terrell, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/1/2021.(JLB)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of B. Birkholz, Michael Carvajal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Michael Terrell Jr. (JGK)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michael Terrell Jr. by Michael Terrell, Jr. (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/31/2021 (MMG).
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Terrell, Jr. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/31/2021 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. Birkholz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Terrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Birkholz
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Carvajal
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?