Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America v. Estate of Shirley M. Morris, The, et al
Plaintiff: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Estate of Shirley M. Morris, The, Michael Morris, Cindy Gregory and Mary Lee Herron
Case Number: 0:2021cv01823
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lindeman, Bradley)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Lindeman, Bradley) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (MTP).
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America re #12 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #13 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Lindeman, Bradley) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (MTP).
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Authorizing Interpleader Deposit #8 Motion to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document, #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (Lindeman, Bradley) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (CLK).
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) : Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Lindeman, Bradley) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (CLK). Modified text on 10/1/2021 (MTP).
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WRONG EVENT USED. WILL REFILE: MOTION to Unseal Pleading/Motion/Other Document filed by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. (Lindeman, Bradley) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (MTP).
September 15, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #7 . Mail sent to Mary Lee Herron at 2675 NE River Rd, Lake Milton, OH 44429, but it was returned not deliverable as addressed. Document re-sent to Ms. Herron at 15342 Highland Park, Strongsville, OH 44136. (CLK)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Mary Lee Herron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(lmb) Document QCd on 10/8/2021 (MMG).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 11/2/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 First NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Navita Lakhram (Lindeman, Bradley)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Michael Morris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JME) Document QC'd on 9/21/2021 (MTP).
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Estate of Shirley M. Morris, The, Cindy Gregory, Michael Morris. (lmb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-1823 (NEB/DTS). (lmb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Estate of Shirley M. Morris, Michael Morris, Cindy Gregory (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8945544) filed by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, ALL SUMMONS FILED IN ERROR-#2 Summons Cindy Gregory, #3 Summons Estate, #4 Summons Michael Morris) (Lakhram, Navita) Modified text on 8/11/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America v. Estate of Shirley M. Morris, The, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Bradley J Lindeman
Represented By: Navita Lakhram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Shirley M. Morris, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lee Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?