Alexis v. Sholom Shaller Family East Campus
Plaintiff: Jean Alexis
Defendant: Sholom Shaller Family East Campus
Case Number: 0:2021cv01882
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION for an Order to deny Motion to Dismiss re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (MTP)
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION for an Order to deny Motion to Dismiss re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jean Alexis.(lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 10/13/2021 (JME).
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Jean Alexis. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 10/13/2021 (JME).
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jean Alexis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-9, #2 Exhibit(s) 10-18)(lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 10/13/2021 (JME).
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION for an Order to deny Motion to Dismiss re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General: Date and time to be determined. (lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 10/13/2021 (JME).
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for an Order to deny Motion to Dismiss re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jean Alexis. (lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 10/13/2021 (JME).
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jean Alexis. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(lmb) Document QC'd by JME on 10/13/2021 (JME).
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sholom Shaller Family East Campus re #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #10 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #11 Declaration in Support, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Louwagie, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration of Samuel N. Louwagie in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Sholom Shaller Family East Campus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Louwagie, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Dismissal #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, #6 Motion to Dismiss/General, #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Louwagie, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REFILED at #11 . Declaration of Samuel N. Louwagie in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Sholom Shaller Family East Campus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Louwagie, Samuel) Modified text on 9/13/2021 (CLK).
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Sholom Shaller Family East Campus. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Louwagie, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Louwagie, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Sholom Shaller Family East Campus. (Louwagie, Samuel)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean Alexis. Sholom Shaller Family East Campus served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (KDS) Document QC'd by JME on 9/3/2021 (JME).
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Re-Issued as to Sholom Shaller Family East Campus. (NAH)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Sholom Shaller Family East Campus (filing fee $402, receipt number 34641016286) filed by Jean Alexis. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH) Document QC'd by JME on 8/26/2021 (JME).
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sholom Shaller Family East Campus. cc: Jean Alexis w/ info sheet over the counter. (NAH)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, HAS BEEN RE-FILED AT NO. 3 - COMPLAINT against Sholom Shaller Family East Campus (filing fee $402, receipt number 34641016286) filed by Jean Alexis. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH) Modified text on 8/20/2021 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis v. Sholom Shaller Family East Campus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Alexis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sholom Shaller Family East Campus
Represented By: R Ann Huntrods
Represented By: Samuel N. Louwagie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?