Stross v. Picture Tiles, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: Picture Tiles, LLC, John Hillcrest and Dayna Hillcrest
Case Number: 0:2021cv01898
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IDENTIFICATION AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David C. Deal, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Entry of Default)(Deal, David)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Deal for Alexander Stross. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/19/2021. (NAH)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Deal. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9049981 filed by Alexander Stross. (Mezera, Douglas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR - AFFIDAVIT of David C. Deal in SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Deal. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9040634 filed by Alexander Stross.(Mezera, Douglas) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (JGK).
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Deal. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9040634 filed by Alexander Stross. (Mezera, Douglas) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (JGK).
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Mezera, Douglas)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David C. Deal as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dayna Hillcrest, John Hillcrest, Picture Tiles, LLC. (lmb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1898 (ECT/LIB). (lmb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Picture Tiles, LLC, John Hillcrest, Dayna Hillcrest (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8967711) filed by Alexander Stross. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mezera, Douglas) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. Picture Tiles, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Douglas C. Mezera
Represented By: David Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Picture Tiles, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hillcrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayna Hillcrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?