WRB, Inc. v. DAMM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WRB, Inc. doing business as Hammer-Schlagen
Defendant: Danielle Nicholas, Allison Reck and DAMM, LLC doing business as Minneschlagen
Counter Defendant: WRB, Inc.
Counter Claimant: DAMM, LLC, Michael Nicholas and Matthew Reck
Case Number: 0:2021cv01899
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) Report by DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck. (Dietz, Paul)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 9/29/2021 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc. The motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Declaration of Ryan Brown in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc., WRB, Inc..(Frasier, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Brett Gorrell in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc., WRB, Inc..(Frasier, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Frasier in SUPPORT OF #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc., WRB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-12)(Frasier, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc., WRB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frasier, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim filed by WRB, Inc.. (Frasier, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXHIBIT List re #19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-P)(Dietz, Paul)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Nicholas in OPPOSITION TO #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck.(Dietz, Paul)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Jess Bengtson in OPPOSITION TO #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck.(Dietz, Paul)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate certificate of word count compliance)(Dietz, Paul)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #16 Letter to District Judge. The request to extend the briefing schedule on the Expedited Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. The parties shall follow the schedule provided to the parties in the Notice of Hearing #13 . Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 9/13/2021.(KMW)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by WRB, Inc. . (Frasier, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by DAMM, LLC after discussion with Court Deputy. (Dietz, Paul)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by WRB, Inc..(Frasier, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Frasier, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc..(Frasier, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Non-Compliance with #Local Rule 7.1 Civil Motion Practice for #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by attorney Chad A Snyder, Michael H Frasier. No Meet & Confer Statement Filed. No Notice of Hearing on Motion Filed. No Proposed Order filed in CM/ECF. Proposed Order not emailed to the Judge in word processing format. Please file according to the rule and contact the appropriate chambers if further direction is needed. (KMW)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T Dietz on behalf of DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck. (Dietz, Paul)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and, Joint COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Allison Reck, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, DAMM, LLC, Matthew Reck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G) (Dietz, Paul) Modified text on 8/31/2021 (MMP).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Frasier, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of James Martin in SUPPORT OF #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc..(Frasier, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frasier, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by WRB, Inc.. (Frasier, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DAMM, LLC, Danielle Nicholas, Michael Nicholas, Allison Reck, Matthew Reck. (MMG)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1899 NEB/TNL. (MMG)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Frasier, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8968147) filed by WRB, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Frasier, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRB, Inc. v. DAMM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WRB, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Frasier
Represented By: Chad A Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DAMM, LLC
Represented By: Paul T Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael Nicholas
Represented By: Paul T Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Matthew Reck
Represented By: Paul T Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Nicholas
Represented By: Paul T Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Reck
Represented By: Paul T Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMM, LLC doing business as Minneschlagen
Represented By: Paul T Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRB, Inc. doing business as Hammer-Schlagen
Represented By: Chad A Snyder
Represented By: Michael H Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?