Royal Pointe Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Royal Pointe Association
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01912
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/24/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 6/15/2022. Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2022. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/21/2021.(TMA)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/21/2021. (TMA)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Williams, Scott) Modified link on 10/22/2021 (lmb).
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Royal Pointe Association. Jointly Signed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Zelzer, Marcus)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus Patrick Zelzer on behalf of Royal Pointe Association. (Zelzer, Marcus)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Royal Pointe Association. (Jadin, Alexander)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Jadin on behalf of Royal Pointe Association. (Jadin, Alexander)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/14/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Williams, Scott)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1912 (MJD/ECW). (lmb)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8971979) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Scott) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Pointe Association v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Pointe Association
Represented By: Alexander M Jadin
Represented By: Ross M Hussey
Represented By: Marcus Patrick Zelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Briana Gornick
Represented By: Scott G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?