Hill v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Patrick Hill
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01926
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE:Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-07126, filed 09/15/2021. (kt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of California. (lmb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-286) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(lmb)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-01926 WMW/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/27/2021.(MTP)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (MTP)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-01926 SRN/HB. (MTP)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8978885) filed by Patrick Hill. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hill
Represented By: Charles H Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?