United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bullard et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission and United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Jason D. Bullard, Angela Romero-Bullard, Bullard Enterprises LLC, DLJ Real Estate L.L.C, Empire Investments L.L.C., Empire Racing Stables L.L.C., TI 13 L.L.C. and Jason Dodd Bullard
Receiver: Receiver
Case Number: 0:2021cv01932
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Authorizing the Payment of Fees Incurred by the Receiver re #61 NOTICE by Receiver First Fee Application. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 5/11/2022.(DLO)
May 11, 2022 Filing 62 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re First Fee Application of Receiver and Manty & Associates #61 Notice (Other). (Manty, Nauni)
April 28, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE by Receiver First Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Manty, Nauni)
April 27, 2022 Filing 60 REPORT by Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Manty, Nauni)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 (Text-Only) ORDER Cancelling Hearing set for 4/26/2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David S. Doty. Ordered by Judge David S. Doty on 4/25/2022.(DLO)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #53 Motion re: claim forms, setting claims bar date, and establishing summary claims procedures Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 4/20/2022. (JRC)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Order of Sale Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 4/20/2022. (JRC)
March 31, 2022 Filing 56 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #53 MOTION to (1) approve claim form, (2) set bar date and (3) establish claims procedure filed by Receiver.(Manty, Nauni)
March 31, 2022 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re #53 MOTION to (1) approve claim form, (2) set bar date and (3) establish claims procedure filed by Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Claim Form, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice for Publication, #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Manty, Nauni)
March 31, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #53 MOTION to (1) approve claim form, (2) set bar date and (3) establish claims procedure : Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Judge David S. Doty. (Manty, Nauni)
March 31, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION to (1) approve claim form, (2) set bar date and (3) establish claims procedure filed by Receiver. (Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Receiver re #47 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property, #46 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #48 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #49 Declaration in Support (Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 51 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #47 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property filed by Receiver.(Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 50 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Receiver re #48 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Receiver.(Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 49 Declaration of Nauni Manty in Support of #47 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property filed by Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) B-21 Day Notice of Sale)(Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Support re #47 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property filed by Receiver.(Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Order of Sale of Real Property filed by Receiver. (Manty, Nauni)
March 25, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Judge David S. Doty. (Manty, Nauni)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Nauni J Manty for Receiver. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 1/27/2022. (DLO)
January 26, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Receiver. (Manty, Nauni)
January 26, 2022 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT by Receiver. (Manty, Nauni)
December 1, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy L Sparling on behalf of Jason Dodd Bullard. (Sparling, Randy)
November 29, 2021 Filing 41 RECEIVER'S LIQUIDATION PLAN by Receiver re #15 Briefing Order . (Manty, Nauni) Modified text on 11/30/2021 (CLK).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Stipulation to Modify Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 11/29/2021.(DLO)
November 29, 2021 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #38 Stipulation. (Manty, Nauni)
November 29, 2021 Filing 38 STIPULATION to Modify Injunction to Terminate Support Payments by Receiver. Jointly Signed by Nauni Manty, Receiver, Jason Bullard, and Angela Romero-Bullard. (Manty, Nauni)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #31 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #32 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #33 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #34 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #35 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #36 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 11/1/2021. (DLO)
November 1, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Relief Defendant TI 13 LLC filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Relief Defendant Empire Racing Stables LLC filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Relief Defendant Empire Investments LLC filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Relief Defendant DLJ Real Estate LLC filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Defendant Bullard Enterprises LLC filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Defendant Jason Bullard filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
November 1, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment of Defendant Angela R. Bullard filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Erica L. Miller re #28 Status Report byReceiver. (Manty, Nauni)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Manty, Nauni)
September 23, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Angela Romero-Bullard waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 22, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. TI 13 L.L.C. waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 22, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Empire Racing Stables L.L.C. waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Empire Investments L.L.C. waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 22, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. DLJ Real Estate L.L.C waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 22, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Bullard Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Jason Dodd Bullard waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Huddleston, Pat)
September 10, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D Smith on behalf of Receiver. (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #5 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 9/10/2021. (DLO)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: SHOW CAUSE Hearing for 9/13/2021 at 9:30 AM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge David S. Doty. (DLO). Modified text on 9/9/2021 (DLO).
September 7, 2021 Filing 17 (Text-Only) NOTICE Setting SHOW CAUSE Hearing for 9/13/2021 at 9:30 AM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge David S. Doty. Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(DLO)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Justin Delfino for United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/31/2021. (NAH)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Appointing Nauni Manty as a Receiver for the Estates of Receivership Defendants. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 8/31/2021.(DLO)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for TRO; Counsel shall appear before this court for a show cause hearing on 9/13/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 8/31/2021. (DLO)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Pat Huddleston for plaintiff; Randy J. Sparling for defendants Jason Dodd Bullard and Bullard Enterprises LLC and Paul Engh for defendant Angela Romero-Bullard. Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2021 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission - argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. TIME IN COURT: 55 minutes. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (DLO)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Dennis Clay Tyson in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Tyson Declaration Exhibits 1-10)(Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Justin Delfino filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (NAH)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Mittleider Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Hairston Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Schwarze Declaration, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Cannon Declaration, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Tranby Declaration, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Connor Declaration, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - Nauni Manty CV, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - Jason Bullard Inv. Testimony Transcript, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - Angela Romero-Bullard Inv. Testimony Transcript)(Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION to Appoint Receiver : Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge David S. Doty. (Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Asset Freeze, Accounting, Appointment of Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Huddleston, Pat)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jason Dodd Bullard, Bullard Enterprises LLC, DLJ Real Estate L.L.C, Empire Investments L.L.C., Empire Racing Stables L.L.C., Angela Romero-Bullard, TI 13 L.L.C. (lmb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-1932 (DSD/TNL). (lmb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Dodd Bullard, Angela Romero-Bullard, Bullard Enterprises LLC, DLJ Real Estate L.L.C, Empire Investments L.L.C., Empire Racing Stables L.L.C., TI 13 L.L.C., filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Huddleston, Pat) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bullard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Pat Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Represented By: Justin Delfino
Represented By: Madison Loomis
Represented By: Pat Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Romero-Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullard Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Real Estate L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Investments L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Racing Stables L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TI 13 L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dodd Bullard
Represented By: Randy L Sparling
Represented By: Randy John Sparling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Receiver
Represented By: Jeffrey D Smith
Represented By: Nauni J Manty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?