MTS Systems Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MTS Systems Corporation
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01945
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by MTS Systems Corporation. Jointly Signed by Federal Insurance Company.(Williams, Scott)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 10/25/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 02:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(TJS)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles) Modified link on 10/4/2021 (lmb).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Federal Insurance Company answer due 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/20/2021.(TJS)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by MTS Systems Corporation. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTS Systems Corporation. Federal Insurance Company served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Williams, Scott)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Federal Insurance Company on September 3, 2021, filed by MTS Systems Corporation. (Williams, Scott) Modified text on 9/14/2021 (lmb).
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (lmb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-1945 (JRT/JFD). (lmb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8986233) filed by MTS Systems Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Scott) Modified text on 8/30/2021 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTS Systems Corporation v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTS Systems Corporation
Represented By: Daniel A Haws
Represented By: Scott G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles E Spevacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?