Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Quigley et al
Plaintiff: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Defendant: Kelly Quigley, Montevideo Public Schools/Independent School District #129, Bill Sprung, Luther Heller and Brock DuMarce
Case Number: 0:2021cv01948
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to E-mail. The Court has received, as an attachment to an email sent to the chambers inbox, a letter from one party seeking a stay of this case. The Court will take no action on this letter. A request to stay a case must be made by formal motion that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, including Local Rule 7.1. A request to stay a case may also be made by stipulation of all parties. If a stay is requested by stipulation, the ECF Procedures Guide of this Court must be followed. The letter was not filed on the docket. Whether made by formal motion or by stipulation, a request to stay a case must be filed on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/26/2021.(TJS)
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Luther Heller.(MMP)
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Schueler, Ken)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Schueler, Ken)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT regarding Defendant Luther Heller. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/19/2021.(TJS)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT regarding Defendant Bill Sprung. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/19/2021.(TJS)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin K Stroup on behalf of Brock DuMarce. (Stroup, Kevin)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brock DuMarce. (Stroup, Kevin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Schueler, Ken)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 10/8/2021.(TJS)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 omplaint filed by Kelly Quigley. (Peterson, Lori) Modified link on 10/4/2021 (lmb).
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori C Peterson on behalf of Kelly Quigley. (Peterson, Lori)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Brock DuMarce served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021; Luther Heller served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021; Montevideo Public Schools/Independent School District #129 served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021; Kelly Quigley served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Bill Sprung served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Schueler, Ken)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice in cases assigned to The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson. (LLM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brock DuMarce, Luther Heller, Montevideo Public Schools/Independent School District #129, Kelly Quigley, Bill Sprung. (MMP)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 21-cv-1948 (PAM/JFD). (MMP)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8986622) filed by Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schueler, Ken)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company v. Quigley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grinnell Mutual Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Ken D Schueler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Quigley
Represented By: Lori C Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montevideo Public Schools/Independent School District #129
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Sprung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock DuMarce
Represented By: Kevin K Stroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?