Moreland et al v. Kladeck, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland, April Puck, Brittany Wilcox, Brooke Marrin, Camila Davalos, Denise Trlica, Emily Sears, Ina Schnitzer, Jaime Longoria, Jamie Middleton, Jennifer Archuleta, Jessica Burciaga, Jessica Hinton, Jessica Rockwell, Lina Posada, Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Maysa Quy, Rhian Sugden, Rosie Wicks, Tara Leigh Patrick and Ursula Mayes
Defendant: Kladeck, Inc. doing business as King of Diamonds
Case Number: 0:2021cv01975
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : (AMENDED) Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Rabuse, Dwight)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (Location Change Only): MOTION to Dismiss/General #11 : The Motion Hearing is scheduled for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MINNEAPOLIS FEDERAL COURTHOUSE) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (KMW)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kladeck, Inc..(Rabuse, Dwight)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Declaration of Debra Kalsbeck in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kladeck, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Rabuse, Dwight)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kladeck, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rabuse, Dwight)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Kladeck, Inc..(Rabuse, Dwight)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Rabuse, Dwight)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kladeck, Inc.. (Rabuse, Dwight)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Kladeck, Inc. answer due 10/15/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/22/2021. (KAT)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation,. (Rabuse, Dwight)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, For Extension of Time to Answer by Kladeck, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Andra Cheri Moreland, April Puck, Brittany Wilcox, Brooke Marrin, Camila Davalos, Denise Trlica, Emily Sears, Ina Schnitzer, Jaime Longoria, and Jamie Middleton. (Rabuse, Dwight)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwight G Rabuse on behalf of Kladeck, Inc.. (Rabuse, Dwight)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edmund S Aronowitz for Jennifer Archuleta, Jessica Burciaga, Camila Davalos, Mariana Davalos, Jessica Hinton, Jaime Longoria, Brooke Marrin, Ursula Mayes, Jamie Middleton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, April Puck, Maysa Quy, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Emily Sears, Rhian Sugden, Denise Trlica, Rosie Wicks, and for Brittany Wilcox. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/13/2021. (NAH)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kladeck, Inc.. (kt)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-1975 NEB/KMM. (kt)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edmund S. Aronowitz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8998343 filed by Jennifer Archuleta, Jessica Burciaga, Camila Davalos, Mariana Davalos, Jessica Hinton, Jaime Longoria, Brooke Marrin, Ursula Mayes, Jamie Middleton, Andra Cheri Moreland, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, April Puck, Maysa Quy, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Emily Sears, Rhian Sugden, Denise Trlica, Rosie Wicks, Brittany Wilcox. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Edmund S. Aronowitz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kladeck, Inc. dba King of Diamonds (filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMNDC-8997841) filed by Jennifer Archuleta, Tara Leigh Patrick, Emily Sears, April Puck, Mariana Davalos, Ursula Mayes, Andra Cheri Moreland, Maysa Quy, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Hinton, Denise Trlica, Brittany Wilcox, Jaime Longoria, Jessica Burciaga, Rosie Wicks, Lina Posada, Jessica Rockwell, Ina Schnitzer, Brooke Marrin, Rhian Sugden, Jamie Middleton, Camila Davalos. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blanchfield, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreland et al v. Kladeck, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Cheri Moreland
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Puck
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Wilcox
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Marrin
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camila Davalos
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sears
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Schnitzer
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Longoria
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Middleton
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Archuleta
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rockwell
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maysa Quy
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Wicks
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Represented By: Roberta A Yard
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kladeck, Inc. doing business as King of Diamonds
Represented By: Dwight G Rabuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?