Doran MGRB II, LLC v. New Hampshire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Doran MGRB II, LLC
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company of PA and New Hampshire Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv01989
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Doran MGRB II, LLC. (Clayton, Lucas)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Bazis, Jeanette)
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Bazis, Jeanette)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Douglas Morgan for New Hampshire Insurance Company; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Wallace Gunn, III for New Hampshire Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/12/2021. (NAH)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. New Hampshire Insurance Company response due 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/5/2021.(TMA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James W. Gunn III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9057861 filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Bazis, Jeanette)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Douglas Morgan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9057851 filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Bazis, Jeanette)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Bazis, Jeanette)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by New Hampshire Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Doran MGRB II, LLC. (Bazis, Jeanette)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doran MGRB II, LLC. New Hampshire Insurance Company served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Clayton, Lucas)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to New Hampshire Insurance Company. (MTP)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New Hampshire Insurance Company filed by Doran MGRB II, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Orman, Jesse) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (MTP).
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doran MGRB II, LLC. New Hampshire Insurance Company of Pa served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Compliance)(Orman, Jesse)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Hampshire Insurance Company of PA. (MMG)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1989 ECT/ECW. (MMG)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Hampshire Insurance Company of PA (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9005105) filed by Doran MGRB II, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orman, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doran MGRB II, LLC v. New Hampshire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doran MGRB II, LLC
Represented By: Dean B Thomson
Represented By: Lucas Clayton
Represented By: Jesse R Orman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company of PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: James Wallace Gunn, III
Represented By: Jeanette M. Bazis
Represented By: Robert Douglas Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?