Huntington National Bank v. Green Sheet Marketing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank
Defendant: Green Sheet Marketing, LLC and Marlon Smith
Case Number: 0:2021cv02000
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Green Sheet Marketing, LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Moak, Daniel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Marlon Smith served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Moak, Daniel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huntington National Bank. Green Sheet Marketing, LLC served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021; Marlon Smith served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Moak, Daniel) Modified text on 10/29/2021 (MMP).
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Huntington National Bank. (Moak, Daniel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Green Sheet Marketing, LLC, Marlon Smith. (MKB)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-2000 (WMW/BRT). (MKB)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Green Sheet Marketing, LLC, Marlon Smith filed by Huntington National Bank. (Moak, Daniel)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Sheet Marketing, LLC, Marlon Smith (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9010437) filed by Huntington National Bank. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-I) (Moak, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntington National Bank v. Green Sheet Marketing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Daniel N Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Sheet Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?