Bethune v. Woodbury Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jason Lavet Bethune
Defendant: Woodbury Police Department, Regions Hospital, 911 Washington County Sheriff and Post Board
Case Number: 0:2021cv02035
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/4/2021. (TJB)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jason Lavet Bethune.(kt)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jason Lavet Bethune. (kt)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/30/2021. (TJB)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jason Lavet Bethune. (kt) Document QC'd on 10/8/2021 (CLK).
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jason Lavet Bethune. (kt) Document QC'd on 10/8/2021 (CLK).
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jason Lavet Bethune. (JGK) Document QC'd on 10/8/2021 (CLK).
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 911 Washington County Sheriff, Post Board, Regions Hospital, Woodbury Police Department filed by Jason Lavet Bethune. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethune v. Woodbury Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lavet Bethune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbury Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 911 Washington County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?