Ybarra v. Kallis
Petitioner: Jeremiah Ybarra
Respondent: Warden Kallis
Case Number: 0:2021cv02062
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(CLK)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Objections to the Report and Recommendation #8 are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation #7 is ACCEPTED in full. The Petition #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Petitioner's Motion in Support of 2241 Petition #2 is DENIED AS MOOT. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/10/2021.(RMM)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation filed by Kallis filed by Kallis. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bildtsen, Ann)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 OBJECTION TO #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeremiah Ybarra, #2 MOTION Motion in Support of re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/1/2021. (BJP)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER to the Clerk's Office from Jeremiah Ybarra re #5 declaring filing fee was sent to the Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QCd on 11/8/2021 (MMG).
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIPT number 44641111978 in the amount of $5 issued to Jeremiah Ybarra. (kt) Document QCd on 10/26/2021 (MMG).
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Bildtsen on behalf of Kallis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bildtsen, Ann)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Jeremiah Ybarra re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Ybarra (NAH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. (NAH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ybarra v. Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Kallis
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?