S.A.A. v. Geisler et al
Plaintiff: S. A. A.
Defendant: Samantha Geisler, Kim, John Joe 1, John Joe 2 and Jane Doe
Case Number: 0:2021cv02071
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. A. A.. S. A. A. waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Sweeney, Nicholas)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by S. A. A.., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. A. A.. S. A. A. waiver sent on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Sweeney, Nicholas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by S. A. A.. No summons requested. (Sweeney, Nicholas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, Samantha Geisler, John Joe 1, John Joe 2, Kim. (MMP)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-2071 (PJS/HB). (MMP)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9031078) filed by S.A.A. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sweeney, Nicholas) Modified text on 9/20/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.A.A. v. Geisler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. A. A.
Represented By: Nicholas Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?