Jackson v. Brooklyn Center Police Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Jackson and Edell Jackson
Defendant: Brooklyn Center Police Dept., Jake Wilkins, Stephen Paster, Joel Iverson and Cooper Gauldin
Case Number: 0:2021cv02072
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
3 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel contacted the Court via email, noting that he appeared on behalf of the plaintiff after the court issued its October 28, 2021 Order regarding IFP status and service #8 . Plaintiff's counsel's email includes two requests, and the Court finds that no formal motion is required under the circumstances. First, plaintiff's counsel asks to be relieved from the requirement in the October 28th Order that Marshal Service Forms be returned to the Clerk of Court by November 27th. Instead, he suggests that he should be allowed to complete service himself. This request is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel may accomplish service in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and need not submit completed Marshal Service Forms. Second, plaintiff's counsel indicates that he intends to amend the complaint, naming different parties. He requests that the court waive the 30-day deadline for service to allow him time to prepare the amended pleading and complete service. This request is also GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel shall file an amended complaint and complete service on the Defendants on or before December 17, 2021. If plaintiff's counsel needs additional time to complete service following the filing of the amended complaint, he may request it by filing a letter on ECF prior to the December 17th deadline. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/18/2021. (BJP)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ratkowski on behalf of Edell Jackson. (Ratkowski, Nicholas)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due enclosing #8 Order on Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Prison Authorities, Sherburne County Jail (CLK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: #8 Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Jackson. (CLK)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/28/2021. (KAT)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 RECEIPT number 44641112240 in the amount of $151.39 issued to Edell Jackson. (lmb) Qc'd on 11/5/2021 (KNK).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Plaintiff Edell Jackson must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $151.39 within 21 days of the date of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/7/2021. (KAT)
October 1, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable 3 . Mail sent to Eddie Jackson at Sherburne County Jail; 13880 Business Center Dr, Suite 200; Elk River, MN 55330, returned, unable to forward. Mail not re-sent. (lmb) Document QCd on 11/18/2021 (MMG).
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Edell Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(MTP)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Edell Jackson. (MTP)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT DUE TO CASE ASSIGNMENT ERROR. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Judge David S. Doty and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2072 SRN/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Eddie Jackson (JGK)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Brooklyn Center Police Dept., Cooper Gauldin, Joel Iverson, Stephen Paster, Jake Wilkins filed by Eddie Jackson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Brooklyn Center Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edell Jackson
Represented By: Nicholas Ratkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Center Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Paster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Gauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?