Schlichting v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Kristen Schlichting
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2021cv02091
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Kristen Schlichting. No summons requested. (Phillips, Tiffany)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. 1. The parties' "Stipulation for Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint and Deadline for Defendant to Respond" [Docket No. 7] is APPROVED; 2. The Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before November 1, 2021; and 3. The Defendant shall have through and including fourteen days from the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/25/2021.(JLB)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Santos, Margaret)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Stipulation for Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint and Deadline for Defendant to Respond by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Kristin Schlichting. (Santos, Margaret)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/24/2021. (NAH)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Santos, Margaret)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9037443 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Life Insurance Company of North America re #1 Notice of Removal, (Santos, Margaret)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-2091 (NEB/LIB). (MMP)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County District Court, case number 05-CV-21-1435 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9037129) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Santos, Margaret) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schlichting v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Schlichting
Represented By: Tiffany L. Phillips
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Margarita Gokhberg
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?