Federal Insurance Company v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 0:2021cv02093
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared Zola. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9155411 filed by 3M Company. (Pieper, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Omid Safa. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9155403 filed by 3M Company. (Pieper, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James R. Murray. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9155394 filed by 3M Company. (Pieper, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Prowant on behalf of 3M Company. (Prowant, Bradley)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Pieper on behalf of 3M Company. (Pieper, Andrew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Insurance Company. 3M Company waiver sent on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Greening, Zachary)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. 3M Company served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Greening, Zachary)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Catherine Geisler for Federal Insurance Company; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Zachary R Greening for Federal Insurance Company; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd S. Schenk for Federal Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/29/2021. (NAH)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zachary R. Greening. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9044474 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2093 JRT/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/23/2021.(CLK) Modified text on 9/23/2021 (CLK).
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (CLK)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-2093 JRT/HB. (CLK)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Catherine Geisler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9038108 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zachary R. Greening. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9038099 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Todd S. Schenk. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9038085 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9037998) filed by Federal Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spevacek, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles E Spevacek
Represented By: Catherine Geisler
Represented By: Todd S. Schenk
Represented By: Zachary R Greening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew J Pieper
Represented By: Bradley R Prowant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?