In re Resideo Technologies, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Plaintiff: Jawad A. Ayaz and Daniel Sanclemente
Defendant: Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Niccolo De Masi, Paul Deninger, Roger Fradin, Jack Lazar, Nina Richardson, Andrew Teich, Sharon Wienbar and Resideo Technologies, Inc.
Petitioner: Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund
Case Number: 0:2021cv02097
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 34 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Brian E. Farnan, Michael J. Farnan, Timothy W. Brown, Ryan D. Stottman, Michael J. Barry as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)cc: Brian E. Farnan, Michael J. Farnan, Ryan D. Stottman, Michael J. Barry. (kt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:20-cv-00915. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright per 3rd/4th Antitrust/Securities List.
September 23, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Minnesota. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Transfer of Venue filed by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/23/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Transfer of Venue by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 Stipulation and Order Extending the Stay filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/8/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 31 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending The Stay (until September 21, 2021) by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Stottmann, Ryan) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 Stipulation and Order Extending the Stay filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/25/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending the Stay until 9-7-21 re #29 Stipulation by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 Stipulation and Order Extending the Stay filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/11/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Stay re SO ORDERED by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Cumings, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Daniel T. Menken on behalf of Defendants Michael Nefkens, Joseph Ragan III, Niccolo de Masi, and Nominal Defendant Residio Technologies, Inc. by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. re #5 Notice of Appearance (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stay of the Consolidated Action to August 10, 2021 filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/30/2021. (etg)[Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stay of the Consolidated Action to August 10, 2021 - filed by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND Stay of the Consolidated Action to July 27, 2021 filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/14/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 13, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stay of the Consolidated Action to July 27, 2021 - filed by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stay of the Consolidated Action to July 13, 2021 filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/21/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Stay of the Consolidated Action to July 13, 2021 - filed by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian E. Farnan (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of the Stay of Consolidated Action to June 13, 2021 filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/12/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of the Stay of Consolidated Action to June 13, 2021 - filed by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of the Stay of Derivative Actions to May 13, 2021 filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/14/21. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of the Stay of Derivative Actions to May 13, 2021 - filed by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Stottmann, Ryan) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy W. Brown for Jawad A. Ayaz, for Daniel Sanclemente added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy Brown filed by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/6/20. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for September 25 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/20. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam D. Warden filed by Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund, #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles Dean Cording filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/20. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam D. Warden - filed by Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund. (Barry, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund. (Barry, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles Dean Cording - filed by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy Brown - filed by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Barry regarding Rivera Beach's Motion to Intervene. (Barry, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status teleconference has been scheduled for September 25, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. The parties can access the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1829 and using the access code 1408971. Counsel shall submit a joint status report by September 23, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/11/20. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #13 Answering Brief in Opposition of Timothy Brown by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Intervene for a Limited Purpose filed by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/18/2020. (Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Letter to Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Barry regarding Motion to Intervene - re #9 MOTION to Intervene for a Limited Purpose. (Barry, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Remark: ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 20-915-LPS ONLY. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00915-LPS, 1:20-cv-01062-LPS (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:20-cv-00915-LPS, 4 in 1:20-cv-01062-LPS) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions, Appointing Lead Counsel, and Staying the Consolidated Action filed by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/25/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00915-LPS, 1:20-cv-01062-LPS (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Intervene for a Limited Purpose filed by Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/11/2020. (Barry, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene for a Limited Purpose - filed by Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barry, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions, Appointing Lead Counsel, and Staying the Consolidated Action by Jawad A. Ayaz, Daniel Sanclemente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings filed by Michael G. Nefkens, Niccolo De Masi, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/20. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings by Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Resideo Technologies, Inc. filed by Resideo Technologies, Inc.. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Menken on behalf of Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc. (Menken, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jawad A. Ayaz. Resideo Technologies, Inc. served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Paul Deninger, Roger Fradin, Jack Lazar, Niccolo De Masi, Michael G. Nefkens, Joseph D. Ragan III, Resideo Technologies, Inc., Nina Richardson, Andrew Teich, Sharon Wienbar - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3041652.) - filed by Jawad A. Ayaz. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 9/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Resideo Technologies, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawad A. Ayaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sanclemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Nefkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D. Ragan III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niccolo De Masi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Deninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Fradin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Teich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Wienbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resideo Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Riviera Beach Police Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?