Reinhardt v. Rent-A-Center West, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew Lee Reinhardt
Defendant: Rent-A-Center West, Inc. and Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc. doing business as Home Choice and Get It Now, LLC doing business as Home Choice
Case Number: 0:2021cv02158
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephanie J. Quincy for Get It Now, LLC and for Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/15/2021. (JGK)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Johanna R. Hyman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9134095 filed by Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hyman, Johanna)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Stephanie J. Quincy as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13W (MPLS) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Hyman, Johanna)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Hyman, Johanna)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc..(Hyman, Johanna)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Hyman, Johanna)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. (Hyman, Johanna)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendants Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. (Hyman, Johanna)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna R. Hyman on behalf of Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc.. (Hyman, Johanna)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Get It Now, LLC, Rent-A-Center West, Inc. (MMP)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-2158 (NEB/LIB). (MMP)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rent-A-Center West, Inc. and Get It Now, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9054951) filed by Andrew Lee Reinhardt. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vavreck, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhardt v. Rent-A-Center West, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lee Reinhardt
Represented By: Mark L Vavreck
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center West, Inc. and Get It Now, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rent-A-Center West, Inc. doing business as Home Choice
Represented By: Johanna R. Hyman
Represented By: Stephanie J. Quincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get It Now, LLC doing business as Home Choice
Represented By: Johanna R. Hyman
Represented By: Stephanie J. Quincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?