O'Donnell v. United States Navy et al
Plaintiff: Mikey J. O'Donnell
Defendant: United States Navy and Carlton County District Court
Case Number: 0:2021cv02184
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER to District Judge by Mikey J. O'Donnell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(lmb)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Mikey J. O'Donnell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(lmb)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, filed by Mikey J. O'Donnell.(KNK)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff Mikey J. O'Donnell's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/7/2021.(RMM)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2184 ECT/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/7/2021.(MMG)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mikey J. O'Donnell. (JGK)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlton County District Court, United States Navy filed by Mikey J. O'Donnell. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Donnell v. United States Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikey J. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?