Kremer v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Sarah Kremer
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 0:2021cv02223
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA. (CLK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Sarah Kremer. (MKB)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Sarah Kremer. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 10/28/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (CLK) Qc'd on 11/18/2021 (KNK).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Sarah Kremer. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/15/2021. (NAH)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 (Text-Only) Notice to Parties: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per #6 Order. Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (KNK)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (KNK)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/13/2021. (TMA)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9073656 filed by Sarah Kremer. (Olson, Edward)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (CLK)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright per Social Security List. Please use case number 21-cv-2223 ECW. (CLK)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Sarah Kremer. (Olson, Edward)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Sarah Kremer. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kremer v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Kremer
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?