Jomo v. Kallis
Plaintiff: Kenyatta Jomo
Defendant: Steve Kallis, Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al. and United States Federal Hospital
Case Number: 0:2021cv02266
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al., United States Federal Hospital . (Repp, Liles)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al., United States Federal Hospital re #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Response (Repp, Liles)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al., United States Federal Hospital.(Repp, Liles)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al., United States Federal Hospital. (Repp, Liles)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kenyatta Jomo. (MTP)
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steve Kallis, Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al., United States Federal Hospital filed by Kenyatta Jomo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MTP)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/27/2021. (EB)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kenyatta Jomo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd on 12/3/2021 (MMG).
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Kenyatta Jomo re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Jomo (NAH)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Steve Kallis filed by Kenyatta Jomo. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (NAH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2021: #1 Envelope) (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jomo v. Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyatta Jomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Federal Medical Center Et. Al.
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Hospital
Represented By: Liles Harvey Repp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?