Carpenter et al v. Marathon Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Martin Carpenter and Jaclyn Ott
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation and St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC doing business as Marathon St. Paul Park Refinery
Case Number: 0:2021cv02268
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Raiter, Shawn)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on #19 Stipulation.Defendants shall have until and including December 24, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and Plaintiffs shall have until January 26, 2022 to respond to Defendants motion or amend their pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/30/2021.(TMA)
November 24, 2021 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 Stipulation. (Davis, Andrew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 SECOND STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. Jointly Signed by Martin Carpenter and Jaclyn Ott. (Davis, Andrew) Modified text on 11/30/2021 (kt).
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Salzman on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. (Salzman, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew J Salzman for Marathon Petroleum Corporation and for St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/23/2021. (NAH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Salzman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9157300 filed by Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. (Davis, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Williams on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. (Williams, Claire)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Poertner on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. (Poertner, Joshua)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Davis on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. (Davis, Andrew)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Migliaccio for Martin Carpenter and for Jaclyn Ott; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Patronella for Martin Carpenter and for Jaclyn Ott. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/8/2021. (NAH)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Marathon Petroleum Corporation response due 12/10/2021; St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC response due 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/1/2021.(TMA)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Patronella. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9117300 filed by Martin Carpenter, Jaclyn Ott. (Goodwin, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas A. Migliaccio. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9117272 filed by Martin Carpenter, Jaclyn Ott. (Goodwin, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #7 Stipulation. (Raiter, Shawn)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Martin Carpenter and Plaintiff Jaclyn Ott. (Raiter, Shawn)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Carpenter, Jaclyn Ott. St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Goodwin, David)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Carpenter, Jaclyn Ott. Marathon Petroleum Corporation served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Goodwin, David)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Nicholas A. Migliaccio, Jason S. Rathod and Mark Patronella as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC. (MMP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-2268 (PJS/ECW). (MMP)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marathon Petroleum Corporation, St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC, (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9079825) filed by Martin Carpenter, Jaclyn Ott. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goodwin, David) Modified text on 10/13/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter et al v. Marathon Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Carpenter
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Ling Shan Wang
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Mark Patronella
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Ott
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Ling Shan Wang
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Mark Patronella
Represented By: Nicholas Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Claire Williams
Represented By: Joshua Poertner
Represented By: Matthew J Salzman
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Park Refining Co. LLC doing business as Marathon St. Paul Park Refinery
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Claire Williams
Represented By: Joshua Poertner
Represented By: Matthew J Salzman
Represented By: Shawn M Raiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?