Chambers v. Rice County et al
Plaintiff: Kayshawn Chambers
Defendant: Rice County, Sheriff Troy Dunn, Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe, Jane Doe 1 through 20, Nichole Sprow, Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20, American Correctional Healthcare, Inc. and Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2021cv02314
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint filed by Troy Dunn, Rice County, Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20. (Angolkar, Stephanie)
December 14, 2021 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint Second Amended Complaint served on Advanced Correctional Healthcare on 12/14/21, filed by Kayshawn Chambers. (Moccio, Vincent)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., Troy Dunn, Rice County, Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20, Nichole Sprow. (MKB)
December 11, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Troy Dunn, Rice County, Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20, Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc. (ACH), Nichole Sprow. filed by Kayshawn Chambers. Filer requests summons issued. (Moccio, Vincent)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #13 Stipulation. Plaintiff may file and serve the proposed Second Amended Complaint within seven days of the date of this Order. Defendants shall answer as required by the rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/2/2021.(TMA)
December 1, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Second Amended Complaint #13 Stipulation. (Moccio, Vincent)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #10 Amended Complaint, to substitute defendant by Kayshawn Chambers. Jointly Signed by Rice County and Sheriff Troy Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Moccio, Vincent)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint filed by Troy Dunn, Rice County, Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20. (Angolkar, Stephanie)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to American Correctional Healthcare, Inc., Troy Dunn, Rice County, Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20, Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe. (MKB)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Troy Dunn, Jane Doe 1 through 20, Rice County, Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe, American Correctional Healthcare, Inc.. filed by Kayshawn Chambers. Filer requests summons issued. (Moccio, Vincent)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Plaintiff may file and serve an amended complaint as agreed to by the parties within five days of the date of this Order. Defendants shall answer as required by the Federal Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/17/2021.(TMA)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation,. (Moccio, Vincent)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to file and serve Amended Complaint by Kayshawn Chambers. Jointly Signed by Rice County, Sheriff Troy Dunn, Kayshawn Chambers, Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe, and Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20,. (Moccio, Vincent)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint on Sheriff Dunn served on Sheriff Dunn on 10/19/2021, filed by Kayshawn Chambers. (Moccio, Vincent)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint on Rice County served on County Board Chair Docken on 10/19/2021, filed by Kayshawn Chambers. (Moccio, Vincent)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Troy Dunn, Jane Doe 1 through 20, Rice County. (Angolkar, Stephanie)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Troy Dunn, Jane Doe 1 through 20, Rice County, Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe. (KNK)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-2314 (PJS/ECW). (KNK)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kayshawn Chambers (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9089366) filed by Kayshawn Chambers. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Moccio, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Rice County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayshawn Chambers
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice County
Represented By: Julia Kelly
Represented By: Stephanie A Angolkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Troy Dunn
Represented By: Julia Kelly
Represented By: Stephanie A Angolkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice County Jail Nurse Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Sprow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice County Corrections Officers John and Jane Doe 1 through 20
Represented By: Julia Kelly
Represented By: Stephanie A Angolkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?