Pollock v. Kallis
Petitioner: Charles W. Pollock, Jr.
Respondent: Steven Kallis
Case Number: 0:2021cv02327
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(MMP)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Objections to the Report and Recommendation #6 are OVERRULED. The Report and Recommendation #5 is ACCEPTED in full. The action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is DENIED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/9/2021.(RMM)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTION TO #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Charles W. Pollock, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles W. Pollock, Jr., #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Charles W. Pollock, Jr filed by Charles W. Pollock, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/4/2021. (TJB)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 44641112282 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Charles Pollock Jr. (CLK) Document QC'd on 11/2/2021 (NAH).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Charles W. Pollock, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) qc'd on 11/18/2021 (KNK).
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Charles W. Pollock Jr. (JGK)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles W. Pollock, Jr. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollock v. Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles W. Pollock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Kallis
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?