Urbanek v. Harpstead
Petitioner: Edward E. Urbanek
Respondent: Jodi Harpstead
Case Number: 0:2021cv02352
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/1/2021.(LNP)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Edward E. Urbanek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(lmb)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Urbanek is ordered to show cause within 30 days of this order why his habeas petition should not be dismissed as untimely. Failure to respond to this order to show cause will result in a recommendation that the petition be dismissed under 2244(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/26/2021.(LNP)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward E. Urbanek. (JGK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Edward E. Urbanek in SUPPORT OF #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Edward E. Urbanek filed by Edward E. Urbanek.(JGK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Edward E. Urbanek. (JGK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edward E. Urbanek. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urbanek v. Harpstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward E. Urbanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jodi Harpstead
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?