Bunde v. City of Madison Lake, The
Plaintiff: Daniel Bunde
Defendant: City of Madison Lake, The
Case Number: 0:2021cv02390
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 12 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: The Settlement Conference is now set for 10/5/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. *TIME CHANGE ONLY. (HAM)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT: Confidential Letter to Court due by 9/28/2022. Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/13/2021. (HAM)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2022. Fact Discovery due by 10/3/2022. Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2022. Motions (non-disp) due 10/3/2022. Motions (disp) due by 1/15/2023. Ready for trial due by 5/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/13/2021.(HAM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/13/2021. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Pretrial Scheduling. (Sullivan, Jana)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by City of Madison Lake, The. Jointly Signed by Daniel Bunde and City of Madison Lake.(Sullivan, Jana)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sandra K Kensy (Kensy, Sandra)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 10:00 AM, by Telephone Conference, before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 21-cv-2390 (NEB/TNL). (MKB)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by The City of Madison Lake. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Sullivan, Jana)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blue Earth County District Court, case number 07-CV-21-3656 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9109582) filed by The City of Madison Lake. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Sullivan, Jana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunde v. City of Madison Lake, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bunde
Represented By: Sandra K Kensy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison Lake, The
Represented By: Jana M O'Leary Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?