Cottman v. Fikes
Petitioner: Antwane Cottman
Respondent: Warden J Fikes
Case Number: 0:2021cv02393
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antwane Cottman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/6/2021. (EB)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/6/2021. (EB)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000163 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Antwane Cottman. (NAH)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of J Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hoskins, Adam)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Antwane Cottman re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Cottman (NAH)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antwane Cottman. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th/Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Cover Letter, #9 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottman v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antwane Cottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden J Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?