Ortega Diaz v. Walgreens Corporation
Plaintiff: Luz Maria Ortega Diaz
Defendant: Walgrees Corporation, a foreign corporation conducting business in the State of Minnesota and Walgreens Corporation
Case Number: 0:2021cv02394
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/9/2022 at 09:00 AM Central time by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Joint update letter by email to chambers due no later than 2/7/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2023. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2022. Motions (disp) due by 1/17/2023. Ready for trial due by 5/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/7/2021.(LNP)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 Text Only Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 12/7/2021 by Conference Bridge. Discussion of pretrial deadlines and early settlement. Pretrial scheduling order to be issued. TIME: 9:16-10:12 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff: Joshua Laabs. Counsel for Defendant: Lauren Hoglund. (LNP)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Hoglund on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoglund, Lauren)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Walgreens Corporation.(Hoglund, Lauren)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Laabs on behalf of Luz Maria Ortega Diaz. (Laabs, Joshua)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/30/2021. Confidential settlement letter due by 11/30/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2021 at 09:15 AM by Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LNP)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-2394 (WMW/HB). (KNK)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walgrees Corporation, a foreign corporation conducting business in the State of Minnesota. (Wood, Brian)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Walgrees Corporation, a foreign corporation conducting business in the State of Minnesota. (Wood, Brian)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9111149) filed by Walgrees Corporation, a foreign corporation conducting business in the State of Minnesota. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega Diaz v. Walgreens Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Maria Ortega Diaz
Represented By: Gary L Manka
Represented By: Joshua Laabs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgrees Corporation, a foreign corporation conducting business in the State of Minnesota
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Corporation
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?