Widner v. Roseville Properties
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Defendant: Roseville Properties
Case Number: 0:2021cv02407
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez (mj)
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMG)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/16/2021.(RJE)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Alsadi, Samantha)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Roseville Properties. Jointly Signed by Travis Widner. (Alsadi, Samantha)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER Cancelling Deadline & Hearing: The Court has been notified that this matter has been resolved, therefore the Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/23/2021. (KAT)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2021 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-2407 WMW/KMM. (CLK)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Roseville Properties. (Andreen, James)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9115054) filed by Roseville Properties. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Andreen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widner v. Roseville Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseville Properties
Represented By: James R Andreen
Represented By: Samantha R. Alsadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?