Gibbons v. Moose Lake Prison et al
Plaintiff: Andrew J Gibbons
Defendant: Moose Lake Prison, Ethan C. Bjorkland, Melinda Erwin, John Myers, Ian Heaslip, Darry Goebel, William Bolin, Bruce Anderson, Jim Carlson, Gene Dornink, Mary Murphy, Luke Frederick, Duane Quam, Benjamin Ehlers and Joint House/Senate Subcommittee on Claims
Case Number: 0:2021cv02416
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 10 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Katherine M. Menendez, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Eric C. Tostrud is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 0:21-cv-02416-KMM-ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JML)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 ADDENDUM re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Andrew J Gibbons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIPT number 44641112470 in the amount of $11.76 issued to Andrew J Gibbons. (MTP) Document QC'd on 11/22/2021 (NAH).
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Andrew J Gibbons. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MTP)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE 1. Plaintiff Andrew J. Gibbons must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $11.76 within 21 days of the date of this order.2.Should Gibbons fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/3/2021.(TMA)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay filed by Andrew J Gibbons. (JGK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Andrew J Gibbons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Andrew J Gibbons. (JGK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Andrew J Gibbons. (JGK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Bruce Anderson, Ethan C. Bjorkland, William Bolin, Jim Carlson, Gene Dornink, Benjamin Ehlers, Melinda Erwin, Luke Frederick, Darry Goebel, Ian Heaslip, Joint House/Senate Subcommittee on Claims, Moose Lake Prison(Claims review; all, individual capacity), Moose Lake Prison, Mary Murphy, John Myers, Duane Quam filed by Andrew J Gibbons. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Attachment for Additional Defendants, #2 Addendum, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Cover Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Envelope) (JGK) Modified text on 11/2/2021 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbons v. Moose Lake Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moose Lake Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan C. Bjorkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Heaslip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darry Goebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Dornink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Quam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joint House/Senate Subcommittee on Claims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?