Aery et al v. Unknown Actors in the Employ of Beltrami County Jail et al
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery and Aaron William Dick
Defendant: Unknown Actors in the Employ of Beltrami County Jail, NMJC, Robert Billings, Sennenfelder, M.E.N.D. and D.O.C.
Case Number: 0:2021cv02422
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John F Docherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 (Text-Only) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #6 , #7 . Mail sent to Aaron William Dick (at Beltrami County Jail; 626 Minnesota Ave NW; Bemidji, MN 56601) returned, unable to forward. Mail not re-sent. (lmb)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Modify Plaintiffs and Defendants; denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Preserve Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/7/2021. (ALM)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint. The Court recommends that Plaintiff Aaron William Dick be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 12/7/2021. (ALM)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Preserve Electronically Stored Information filed by James Paul Aery. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MMP)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Modify Plaintiffs & Defendants re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by James Paul Aery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 11/3/2021. (ALM)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James Paul Aery. (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/1/2021 (MTP).
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Robert Billings, D.O.C., M.E.N.D., NMJC, Sennenfelder, Unknown Actors in the Employ of Beltrami County Jail filed by James Paul Aery, Aaron William Dick. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 6th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/1/2021 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aery et al v. Unknown Actors in the Employ of Beltrami County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paul Aery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron William Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Actors in the Employ of Beltrami County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMJC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sennenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.E.N.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?