Ybarra v. Besile
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Ybarra
Defendant: Chaplain Besile
Case Number: 0:2021cv02424
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
2 Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez to District Judge, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-2424 (PAM/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and deadlines in these cases may be reset (if necessary) by the new MJ Courtroom Deputy. (lmb)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jeremiah Ybarra, #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/20/2021. (KAT)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Mr. Ybarra must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $45.77 within 20 days of the date of this order. Should Mr. Ybarra fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/16/2021. (KAT)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(kt)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Jeremiah Ybarra re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Ybarra (NAH)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Besile filed by Jeremiah Ybarra. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ybarra v. Besile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Besile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?