Prouty v. Kosloski et al
Plaintiff: Darrell D. Prouty
Defendant: Andrea Marlee Kosloski, Sara Kulas and Dana Osbourne
Case Number: 0:2021cv02431
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMG)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff Darrell D. Prouty's complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. 2. Plaintiff Darrell D. Prouty's applications to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , #4 are DENIED AS MOOT. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/16/2021. (RJE)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darrell D. Prouty. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Declaration of Service, #3 Envelope)(MMP)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Darrell D. Prouty. (NAH)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea Marlee Kosloski, Sara Kulas, Dana Osbourne filed by Darrell D. Prouty. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope (Exhibits), #4 Envelope) (NAH) Modified text on 11/4/2021 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prouty v. Kosloski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell D. Prouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Marlee Kosloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Kulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Osbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?