Ching v. City of Minneapolis et al
Plaintiff: Florine K. Ching
Defendant: City of Minneapolis, Ofc. Neal Walsh, Ofc. Ryan Keyes and Police Chief Medaria Arradondo
Case Number: 0:2021cv02467
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 21 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by City of Minneapolis, Neal Walsh and jointly by Florine Ching. (Lathrop, Sara)
January 3, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Florine Ching.(Lathrop, Sara)
December 29, 2021 Filing 19 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Katherine M. Menendez, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Donovan W. Frank is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 0:21-cv-02467-KMM-DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JML)
December 28, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #8 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, filed by City of Minneapolis. (Lathrop, Sara)
December 21, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by City of Minneapolis.(Lathrop, Sara)
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by City of Minneapolis.(Lathrop, Sara)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by City of Minneapolis. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lathrop, Sara)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Lathrop, Sara)
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by City of Minneapolis. (Lathrop, Sara)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Minneapolis re #8 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, (Lathrop, Sara)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 1/4/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/4/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB)
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #8 , #7 Sealed Document(s) - #7 Sealed Exhibit, #8 Sealed Exhibit . (Lathrop, Sara) Modified text on 12/10/2021 (CLK).
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT Exhibit C to Answer of Def City of Mpls re #6 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis. (Lathrop, Sara)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBIT Placeholder for Exhibit B to Answer of Def City of Mpls re #6 Answer to Amended Complaint by City of Minneapolis. Portable media received and scanned by IS staff. FILED CONVENTIONALLY AND UNDER SEAL IN THE CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/13/2021. (Lathrop, Sara) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (CLK).
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBIT Placeholder for Exhibit A to Answer of Def City of Mpls re #6 Answer to Amended Complaint by City of Minneapolis. Portable media received and scanned by IS staff. FILED CONVENTIONALLY AND UNDER SEAL IN THE CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/13/2021. (Lathrop, Sara) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (CLK).
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint filed by City of Minneapolis. (Lathrop, Sara)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Medaria Arradondo, City of Minneapolis, Ryan Keyes, Neal Walsh. (MTP)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Florine K. Ching. Filer requests summons issued. (Bosman, Paul)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Minneapolis, Ryan Keyes, Neal Walsh. (CLK)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-2467 DWF/DTS. (CLK)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florine K Ching (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9132646) filed by Florine K Ching. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bosman, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ching v. City of Minneapolis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florine K. Ching
Represented By: Paul J Bosman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Mark S Enslin
Represented By: Sara J Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Neal Walsh
Represented By: Sara J Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Ryan Keyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Medaria Arradondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?