LifeWave, Inc. et al v. Burtis et al
Plaintiff: LIFEWAVE, INC., DAVID SCHMIDT and LifeWave
Defendant: ROBERT BURTIS and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 0:2021cv02479
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the elevation of Judge Katherine M. Menendez, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 0:21-cv-02479-KMM-ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JML)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LifeWave, David Schmidt. Robert Burtis served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Parker, Andrew)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Danna Cotman for LifeWave and for David Schmidt.; granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ariel Sabban for LifeWave and for David Schmidt. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/16/2021. (JGK)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert Burtis, Does. (lmb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-2479 (WMW/ECW). (lmb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ariel J. Sabban. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9139099 filed by LIFEWAVE, INC., DAVID SCHMIDT. (Parker, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse H Kibort on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kibort, Jesse)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Parker on behalf of LIFEWAVE, INC., DAVID SCHMIDT. (Parker, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Danna J. Cotman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9138848 filed by LIFEWAVE, INC., DAVID SCHMIDT. (Parker, Andrew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9137759) filed by LIFEWAVE, INC., DAVID SCHMIDT. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LifeWave, Inc. et al v. Burtis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFEWAVE, INC.
Represented By: Jesse H Kibort
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SCHMIDT
Represented By: Jesse H Kibort
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Ariel Sabban
Represented By: Danna Cotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LifeWave
Represented By: Andrew D Parker
Represented By: Ariel Sabban
Represented By: Danna Cotman
Represented By: Jesse H Kibort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BURTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?